Beaumont v. Layton et al

Plaintiff: Thomas W Beaumont
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Corporation, Donald H Layton, Palmetto State Bank and Montague Laffitte
Case Number: 9:2018cv03142
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 21 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #20 Roseboro Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Thomas W Beaumont. (hada, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Response to Motion due by 2/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/07/2019. (hada, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Strike #3 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, Response filed by Federal National Mortgage Corporation, Montague Laffitte, Donald H Layton, Palmetto State Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Law Blevins, #2 Certificate of Service)(Muthig, Kathleen)
January 4, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal National Mortgage Corporation, Montague Laffitte, Donald H Layton, Palmetto State Bank re #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Muthig, Kathleen)
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Federal National Mortgage Corporation, Montague Laffitte, Donald H Layton, Palmetto State Bank. Response to Motion due by 1/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Case Law Chabot, #4 Exhibit Case Law Dooly, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Attorneys Fee)No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Muthig, Kathleen)
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike #3 Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim, by Thomas W Beaumont. Response to Motion due by 1/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope) Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker. (hada, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT RE-MAILED corrected #12 Scheduling Order placed in U.S. Mail to Thomas W Beaumont (ssam, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Scheduling Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Thomas W Beaumont. (hada, )
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion to Amend Pleadings 12/27/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/28/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/25/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/25/2019, Discovery due by 3/27/2019, Motions due by 5/28/2019, Mediation Due by 4/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 11/27/2018. (hada, ) (Main Document 12 replaced on 11/28/2018) (ssam, ). Modified to edit text and to replace with correct document on 11/28/2018 (ssam, ).
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #10 Order to Notify of Address Change, placed in U.S. Mail to Thomas W Beaumont. (hada, )
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 11/26/2018. (hada, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal National Mortgage Corporation, Montague Laffitte, Donald H Layton, Palmetto State Bank re #3 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, (Muthig, Kathleen)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Thomas W Beaumont by Montague Laffitte, Federal National Mortgage Corporation, Donald H Layton, Palmetto State Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Notice of Debt, #2 Exhibit 2- Note & Mortgage, #3 Exhibit 3- Servicing Disclosure Statement, #4 Exhibit 4- Note & Mortgage, #5 Exhibit 5- Servicing Disclosure Statement, #6 Exhibit 6- Lump-Sum Payment Note (Swan Lake), #7 Exhibit 7- Lump-Sum Payment Note (Grober Hill))(Muthig, Kathleen) Modified to add descriptive names to exhibits as provided by filing user on 11/26/2018 (ssam, ).
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal National Mortgage Corporation, Montague Laffitte, Donald H Layton, Palmetto State Bank re #1 Notice of Removal (Muthig, Kathleen)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Federal National Mortgage Corporation, Montague Laffitte, Donald H Layton, Palmetto State Bank.(ssam, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Federal National Mortgage Corporation, Montague Laffitte, Donald H Layton, Palmetto State Bank.(ssam, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas for Beaufort County, case number 2018-CP-07-02088. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8119236), filed by Federal National Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (hada, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/26/2018) (ssam, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2018: #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (ssam, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2018: #3 Joinder and Consent to Removal) (ssam, ). Modified to correct filer on 11/26/2018 (ssam, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaumont v. Layton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W Beaumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: A Parker Barnes, III
Represented By: Kathleen McDavid Muthig
Represented By: Robert Yates Knowlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald H Layton
Represented By: A Parker Barnes, III
Represented By: Kathleen McDavid Muthig
Represented By: Robert Yates Knowlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmetto State Bank
Represented By: A Parker Barnes, III
Represented By: Kathleen McDavid Muthig
Represented By: Robert Yates Knowlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montague Laffitte
Represented By: A Parker Barnes, III
Represented By: Kathleen McDavid Muthig
Represented By: Robert Yates Knowlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?