Regan Tile Inc v. Carothers Construction Inc et al
Plaintiff: Regan Tile Inc
Defendant: Carothers Construction Inc and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2018cv03343
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Support re #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration Response filed by Regan Tile Inc. (Rash, Eugene)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regan Tile Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rash, Eugene)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regan Tile Inc. Carothers Construction Inc served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Rash, Eugene)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Butler, Drew)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Butler, Drew)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 Carothers Construction, Inc.'s Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carothers Construction Inc.(Beaver, Ryan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 Carothers Construction, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Carothers Construction Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subcontract)(Beaver, Ryan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration by Carothers Construction Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Ben Logan Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Demand for Arbitration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 AAA Rule 12B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 SC Code 15-7-120, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 MCAS Beaufort information)No proposed order.(Beaver, Ryan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carothers Construction Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (vdru, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Regan Tile Inc.(vdru, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carothers Construction Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8153652.), filed by Regan Tile Inc. Service due by 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: June 2015 Subcontract, #2 Exhibit B: Charge Orders, #3 Exhibit C: Bond).(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regan Tile Inc v. Carothers Construction Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regan Tile Inc
Represented By: Eugene F Rash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carothers Construction Inc
Represented By: Ryan Lee Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Drew Hamilton Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?