Goff et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp et al
Plaintiff: Gregg Goff and Virginia Goff
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp, Troy Christopher Cummings and HUB International Southeast
Case Number: 9:2019cv00101
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support Response filed by HUB International Southeast. (Allen, Christy)
February 28, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support Response filed by Gregg Goff, Virginia Goff.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/7/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Gregg Goff, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excepts of Cummings Deposition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Complaint in State Court Case, #4 Exhibit 4 - Stipulation of Dismissal in State Court Case)(Bowen, John)
February 28, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support Response filed by Gregg Goff, Virginia Goff.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/7/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation of Dismsisal in State Court Case)(Bowen, John)
February 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by John Rhett Crosswell Bowen for March 11 - 15, 2019, April 24-26, 2019, May 3- 6, 2019, June 26, 2019 - July 1, 2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Request for Protection)(Bowen, John)
February 18, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Gregg Goff, Virginia Goff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cummings Deposition Excerpts)(Bowen, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support by Troy Christopher Cummings. Response to Motion due by 2/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Allen, Christy)
February 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support by HUB International Southeast. Response to Motion due by 2/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Allen, Christy)
February 13, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand Response filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/20/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Morgan, Grenville)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand Response filed by HUB International Southeast.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/19/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Allen, Christy)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Gregg Goff, Virginia Goff. Response to Motion due by 2/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memo in Support - Affidavit of Gregg Goff)No proposed order.(Bowen, John)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Troy Christopher Cummings answer due 2/14/2019; HUB International Southeast answer due 2/14/2019. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/23/2019.(vdru, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Beaufort County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Acknowledgment of Receipt of Notice of Removal)(Allen, Christy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Support re #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Response filed by Gregg Goff, Virginia Goff. (Bowen, John)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gregg Goff, Virginia Goff.(Bowen, John)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Troy Christopher Cummings, HUB International Southeast. Response to Motion due by 2/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Allen, Christy)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American Strategic Insurance Corp.(Morgan, Grenville)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Troy Christopher Cummings.(vdru, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by HUB International Southeast.(vdru, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-07-2364. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8206845), filed by HUB International Southeast, Troy Christopher Cummings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Docs, #2 Exhibit B: Affidavit of Robert Knowles). (vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goff et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp
Represented By: Grenville Delorme Morgan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Christopher Cummings
Represented By: Christy Ford Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUB International Southeast
Represented By: Christy Ford Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg Goff
Represented By: John Rhett Crosswell Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Goff
Represented By: John Rhett Crosswell Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?