Solar Eclipse Investment Fund XXXV LLC et al v. 5000000 dollars in US Currency et al

Plaintiff: Solar Eclipse Investment Fund XXXV LLC and East West Bank
Defendant: 5000000 dollars in US Currency and Strauss Law Firm LLC, The
Case Number: 9:2019cv01176
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Beaufort Office
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED Certified Return Receipt 11 Order on Motion to Expedite, 12 Notice of Hearing on Motion, placed in U.S. Mail to The Strauss Law Firm LLC, 10 Hospital Center Common, Suite 400, Hilton Head Island, SC 29926 (sshe, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Solar Eclipse Investment Fund XXXV LLC, East West Bank. Strauss Law Firm LLC, The served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Shoun, Cheryl)
April 30, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Expedited Hearing, Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Memo in Support served on The Strauss Law Firm on April 29, 2019, filed by East West Bank, Solar Eclipse Investment Fund XXXV LLC. (Shoun, Cheryl)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND OPINION granting #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to effectuate actual service of this temporary restraining order on The Strauss Law Firm, LLC, pursuant to Rule 65(d)(2). Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/30/2019.(eric, ) (Main Document 14 replaced on 5/1/2019) (sshe, ). Modified on 5/1/2019 to replace with corrected document (case number division typo)(sshe, ).
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION byEast West Bank, Solar Eclipse Investment Fund XXXV LLC re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Shoun, Cheryl)
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing on #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2019 at 3:30 PM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. DEFENDANT is DIRECTED to file any response in opposition to #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before May 3, 2019. PLAINTIFFS are DIRECTED to immediately attempt to provide Defendant with notice of this Text Order, such as via email, and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Text Order to Defendant at its publicly available corporate address. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M. Gergel.(ltap, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Expedite Hearing on #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/30/2019.(ltap, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injuction by East West Bank, Solar Eclipse Investment Fund XXXV LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Shoun, Cheryl)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . First attachment description: Memorandum in Support of Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support , #2 Exhibit A Declaration of Kyra Lucchesi, #3 Exhibit B Declaration of Curtis C Jung)(Shoun, Cheryl) Modified on 4/25/2019 to add descriptions to exhibit(s)(sshe, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/26/2019) (sshe, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/26/2019) (sshe, ). Modified on 4/26/2019 to replace with corrected complete documents as requested and provided by filing user(sshe, ).
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by East West Bank, Solar Eclipse Investment Fund XXXV LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wire Transfer)No proposed order.(Shoun, Cheryl) Modified on 4/25/2019 to reference #9 Additional Attachments filed 4/24/2019(sshe, ).
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to 5000000 dollars in US Currency, Strauss Law Firm LLC, The. (sshe, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by East West Bank.(sshe, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Solar Eclipse Investment Fund XXXV LLC.(sshe, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by East West Bank.(sshe, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Solar Eclipse Investment Fund XXXV LLC.(sshe, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 5000000 dollars in US Currency, Strauss Law Firm LLC, The ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8402034.), filed by Solar Eclipse Investment Fund XXXV LLC, East West Bank. Service due by 7/22/2019(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solar Eclipse Investment Fund XXXV LLC et al v. 5000000 dollars in US Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solar Eclipse Investment Fund XXXV LLC
Represented By: Cheryl D Shoun
Represented By: Valentine Henry Stieglitz, III
Represented By: R Bruce Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East West Bank
Represented By: Cheryl D Shoun
Represented By: Valentine Henry Stieglitz, III
Represented By: R Bruce Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5000000 dollars in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strauss Law Firm LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?