Morris v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Jessica Barbara Morris
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record
Case Number: 9:2019cv01378
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Barbara Morris. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 5/14/2019, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Cards)(Barroll, J)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 5/14/2019.(elac, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Jessica Barbara Morris. Response to Motion due by 5/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(cpeg, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cpeg, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/13/2019) (cpeg, ).
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Jessica Barbara Morris. Service due by 8/8/2019(cpeg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Barbara Morris
Represented By: J Leeds Barroll, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?