Hartsell v. United States of America, The
Plaintiff: Fletcher Lee Hartsell, Jr
Defendant: United States of America, The
Case Number: 9:2019cv01388
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/30/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/13/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/13/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/7/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/6/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/6/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/13/2019, Discovery due by 1/6/2020, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 1/20/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Trial Deadline on or after 4/2/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/9/2019. (sshe, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America, The.(Berlinsky, Lee)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States of America, The.(Berlinsky, Lee)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, The. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (sshe, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fletcher Lee Hartsell, Jr.(sshe, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, The ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8439424.), filed by Fletcher Lee Hartsell, Jr. Service due by 8/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit S.C. Code Anno. 15-36-100 Affidavit)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartsell v. United States of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fletcher Lee Hartsell, Jr
Represented By: Marion C Fairey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, The
Represented By: Lee Ellis Berlinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?