Simmons v. McCabe et al
Plaintiff: Leon J. Simmons
Defendant: Major Smith, Lieutenant Danley, Classification Off White, Head Nurse Ussery, Christina Long, Wayne McCabe, Lieutenant Baker, Head Nurse Robins, Kevin Ford, Benjamin Davis, Food Service Directo Bragg, Joseph Canning, Lieutenant Blackwell and Food Service Director Bragg
Case Number: 9:2019cv01649
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Leon Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (egra, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Baker, Blackwell, Joseph Canning, Danley, Benjamin Davis, Food Service Director Bragg, Kevin Ford, Christina Long, Wayne McCabe, Robins, Smith, Ussery, White. Service due by 10/24/2019. (egra, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Order 1983, 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Leon J. Simmons 366048 Kershaw Correctional Institution 4848 Goldmine Hwy Kershaw, SC 29067 (egra, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REFERENCE #8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/25/2019. (egra, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER authorizing service of process and collection of filing fee. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350. Plaintiff is also directed to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/25/2019. (egra, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (egra, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Leon J. Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope) Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (egra, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baker, Blackwell, Bragg, Joseph Canning, Danley, Benjamin Davis, Kevin Ford, Christina Long, Wayne McCabe, Robins, Smith, Ussery, White, filed by Leon J. Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. McCabe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Danley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classification Off White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Head Nurse Ussery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Head Nurse Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Service Directo Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Canning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Service Director Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon J. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?