Bax et al v. Allstate Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Arie D Bax, Joseph Christoff, S Naki Richardson-Bax and Felicia Christoff
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Co
Case Number: 9:2019cv01719
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #8 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, #9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, 9/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (jbry, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Allstate Insurance Co.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/22/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Robinson, Laura)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Arie D Bax, Felicia Christoff, Joseph Christoff, S Naki Richardson-Bax. Response to Motion due by 7/15/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Allstate Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Allstate Notice of Removal)No proposed order.(Bax, Arie) Modified on 7/8/2019 to add descriptions to exhibits (jbry, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Arie D Bax, Felicia Christoff, Joseph Christoff, S Naki Richardson-Bax. Response to Motion due by 7/15/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint)No proposed order.(Bax, Arie) Modified on 7/8/2019 to add description to exhibit(jbry, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Arie D Bax, Felicia Christoff, Joseph Christoff, S Naki Richardson-Bax. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Bax, Arie)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion by Sean P. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/26/2019.(jbry, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean P. Sullivan ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8523737) by Allstate Insurance Co. Response to Motion due by 7/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Robinson, Laura)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Allstate Insurance Co. (jbry, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Insurance Co.(jbry, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-07-01058. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8506301), filed by Allstate Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents - Exhibits A and B)(jbry, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/17/2019) (jbry, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/17/2019) (jbry, ). Modified on 6/17/2019 to replace incorrect documents with corrected documents as provided by filing user (jbry, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bax et al v. Allstate Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arie D Bax
Represented By: Arie David Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Christoff
Represented By: Arie David Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S Naki Richardson-Bax
Represented By: Arie David Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Christoff
Represented By: Arie David Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Co
Represented By: Laura Robinson
Represented By: Sean P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?