Battle v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Battle
Defendant: Warden Cecilia Reynolds, Bernadette P. Richardson, Angela Leatherwood and South Carolina Department of Corrections
Case Number: 9:2019cv01739
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
2 Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker: Global Status Conference held on 8/13/2019. Court Reporter Virginia Druce, CourtSmart. (hhil, )
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JOINT AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/6/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/3/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/6/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/6/2020, Discovery due by 6/3/2020, Motions due by 8/3/2020, Mediation Due by 7/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 08/12/2019. (hada, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Angela Leatherwood, Cecilia Reynolds, Bernadette P. Richardson, South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Trask, Lauren)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Angela Leatherwood, Cecilia Reynolds, Bernadette P. Richardson, South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Trask, Lauren)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Angela Leatherwood, Cecilia Reynolds, Bernadette P. Richardson, South Carolina Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trask, Lauren)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Take Deposition. The Court grants Defendants' Motion and orders that Defendants be granted leave to take the deposition of inmate Nathan Battle, #354044, in September of 2019 at the Tyger River Correctional Institution of the South Carolina Department of Corrections or the institution where the inmate is housed within the South Carolina Department of Corrections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 08/09/2019. (egra, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Take Deposition from Nathan Battle by Angela Leatherwood, Cecilia Reynolds, Bernadette P. Richardson, South Carolina Department of Corrections. Response to Motion due by 8/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Trask, Lauren)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Global Status Conference set for 8/13/2019 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #6, U. S. Court House, 85 Broad St, Charleston before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. The District Judges have assigned all of the cases alleging systemic prison violence at SCDC, brought by the Bell Legal Group, to Judge Baker for pretrial handling. At the global status conference, Judge Baker will discuss how these cases will be handled moving forward. (hada, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant no longer assigned to the case. NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER: Please note the case number for this action has changed to 9:19-cv-1739-TMC-MGB. (bshr, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/29/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/12/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/2/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/2/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/4/2019, Discovery due by 1/3/2020, Motions due by 3/3/2020, Mediation Due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/08/2019. (egra, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nathan Battle.(Bell, James)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Angela Leatherwood, Cecilia Reynolds, Bernadette P. Richardson, South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Settana, Daniel)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (egra, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Angela Leatherwood, Cecilia Reynolds, Bernadette P. Richardson, South Carolina Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (egra, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-31-00152. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8510507), filed by South Carolina Department of Corrections, Cecilia Reynolds, Bernadette P. Richardson, Angela Leatherwood. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Certificate of Service) (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battle v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Cecilia Reynolds
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Daniel R Settana, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette P. Richardson
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Daniel R Settana, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Leatherwood
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Daniel R Settana, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Represented By: Lauren Glazer Trask
Represented By: Daniel R Settana, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Battle
Represented By: Victoria S H Knight
Represented By: James Edward Bell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?