Hardin v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tracy Lee Hardin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record
Case Number: 9:2019cv01848
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy Lee Hardin. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 7/5/2019, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service green cards)(McDaniel, Christi)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 07/02/2019. (cpeg, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/02/2019.(cpeg, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Tracy Lee Hardin. Response to Motion due by 7/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(cpeg, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due 9/26/2019. (cpeg, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Tracy Lee Hardin. Service due by 9/26/2019(cpeg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardin v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Lee Hardin
Represented By: Christi Barfield McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?