Epstein v. Town of Bluffton
Plaintiff: Sheldon A. Epstein
Defendant: Town of Bluffton
Case Number: 9:2019cv02251
Filed: August 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant's Subpoena to Plaintiff's Current Employer MOTION to Quash Defendant's Subpoena to Plaintiff's Current Employer Response filed by Town of Bluffton.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/10/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Lohr, Mary)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Protective Order Defendant's Subpoena to Plaintiff's Current Employer, MOTION to Quash Defendant's Subpoena to Plaintiff's Current Employer ( Response to Motion due by 10/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Sheldon A. Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sheldon Epstein's Declaration, #2 Exhibit Defense Counsel's letter to Mr. Epstein's current employer, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Subpoena to Mr. Epstein's Current Employer)No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Mullaney, Marybeth)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/30/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/14/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/24/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/4/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/4/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/3/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/3/2020, Discovery due by 3/3/2020, Motions due by 5/31/2020, Mediation Due by 4/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 09/09/2019. (egra, ) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/9/2019) (egra, ). Modified on 9/9/2019 to correct date in scheduling order as directed by chambers (egra, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Town of Bluffton.(Lohr, Mary)
August 11, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sheldon A. Epstein. (egra, )
August 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Town of Bluffton. Service due by 11/12/2019. (egra, )
August 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Town of Bluffton ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8606933.), filed by Sheldon A. Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Right to Sue Letter) (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epstein v. Town of Bluffton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheldon A. Epstein
Represented By: Marybeth E Mullaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Bluffton
Represented By: Mary Bass Lohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?