Hallett et al v. Government Employee Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Kerin Jose Estrada-Aguilar, Robert Hallett, Mariam Hallett, Gregory Hall and Carrie Hall
Defendant: Government Employee Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv02319
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 19 Defendants Carrie Hall and Gregory Hall's ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff by Carrie Hall, Gregory Hall.(Nickels, Christopher)
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Robert Hallett, Mariam Hallett. Kerin Jose Estrada-Aguilar served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Acceptance of Service)(Moose, Julie)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Robert Hallett, Mariam Hallett. Carrie Hall served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019; Gregory Hall served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Acceptance of Service)(Moose, Julie)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO CONDUCT MEDIATION Mediation Due by 3/17/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/23/2019. (sshe, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kerin Jose Estrada-Aguilar.(Berglind, Mark)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Kerin Jose Estrada-Aguilar.(Berglind, Mark)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Government Employee Insurance Company.(Robinson, Jonathan)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER The Court GRANTS Defendant's motion to realign the co-defendants. (Dkt. No. #4 .) The Court finds that co-defendants Carrie Hall, Gregory Hall, and Kerin Jose Estrada-Aguilar should be realigned as Plaintiffs in this case. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/18/2019.(sshe, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Counterclaim #10 by Mariam Hallett, Robert Hallett.(Moose, Julie)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Government Employee Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 2-1 Exhibit A Policy)(Robinson, Jonathan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Realign the Co-Defendants Response filed by Mariam Hallett, Robert Hallett.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/5/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Moose, Julie)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mariam Hallett, Robert Hallett.(Moose, Julie)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY by Mariam Hallett, Robert Hallett to #2 Answer to Complaint Notice of Removal, Counterclaim . (Moose, Julie)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/9/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/23/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 9/23/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/17/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/16/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/23/2020, Discovery due by 2/17/2020, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 3/2/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 6/1/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/19/2019. (sshe, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Realign the Co-Defendants by Government Employee Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(sshe, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Government Employee Insurance Company.(sshe, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), COUNTERCLAIM against Mariam Hallett, Robert Hallett by Government Employee Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy)(sshe, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-07-01539. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8619092), filed by Government Employee Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Part 1, #2 State Court Documents Part 2, #3 State Court Documents Part 3)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hallett et al v. Government Employee Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerin Jose Estrada-Aguilar
Represented By: Mark S Berglind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hallett
Represented By: Julie Jeffords Moose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariam Hallett
Represented By: Julie Jeffords Moose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hall
Represented By: Christopher W Nickels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Hall
Represented By: Christopher W Nickels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employee Insurance Company
Represented By: Shanon Nicole Peake
Represented By: G Murrell Smith, Jr
Represented By: Jonathan M Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?