Bazemore et al v. Smalls
Plaintiff: Donnie R Bazemore and Rebecca R Bazemore
Defendant: Genever Manigo Smalls
Not Yet Classified: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv02600
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant Smalls' Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Genever Manigo Smalls. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McLaren, Amy)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Smalls' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Genever Manigo Smalls. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McLaren, Amy)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ernest Mitchell Griffith on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Griffith, Ernest)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donnie R Bazemore, Rebecca R Bazemore. Genever Manigo Smalls served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Akins, Dale)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donnie R Bazemore, Rebecca R Bazemore. Genever Manigo Smalls served on 9/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Akins, Dale)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Genever Manigo Smalls. (jbry, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Donnie R Bazemore, Rebecca R Bazemore.(jbry, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Genever Manigo Smalls ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8668697.), filed by Donnie R Bazemore, Rebecca R Bazemore. Service due by 12/12/2019(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bazemore et al v. Smalls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genever Manigo Smalls
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth McLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie R Bazemore
Represented By: Dale Ernest Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca R Bazemore
Represented By: Dale Ernest Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Ernest Mitchell Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?