Donnelly Yachts LLC v. J&W Corporation of Greenwood
Plaintiff: Donnelly Yachts LLC
Defendant: J&W Corporation of Greenwood
Case Number: 9:2020cv01154
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 26(f) Report and Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Donnelly Yachts LLC.(Bowen, John)
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by J&W Corporation of Greenwood.(Taylor, Thomas) Filing corrected for event type (sshe, )
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO CONDUCT MEDIATION Mediation Due by 11/19/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/13/2020. (sshe, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Donnelly Yachts LLC.(Bowen, John)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/7/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/22/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 5/22/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/17/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/18/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/25/2020, Discovery due by 10/19/2020, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 11/2/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Bench Trial Deadline on or after 2/2/2021 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/16/2020. (sshe, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Counterclaim #6 by Donnelly Yachts LLC. (Bowen, John) Filing corrected for event type. (sshe, ) .
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by J&W Corporation of Greenwood.(Taylor, Thomas)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant J & W's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by J&W Corporation of Greenwood.(Taylor, Thomas)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Donnelly Yachts LLC. J&W Corporation of Greenwood served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Bowen, John)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to J&W Corporation of Greenwood. (jbry, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Donnelly Yachts LLC.(jbry, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J&W Corporation of Greenwood ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9018547.), filed by Donnelly Yachts LLC. Service due by 6/22/2020(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donnelly Yachts LLC v. J&W Corporation of Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnelly Yachts LLC
Represented By: John Rhett Crosswell Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&W Corporation of Greenwood
Represented By: Thomas Calvin Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?