Hopkins v. Pulte Homes of South Carolina Inc et al
Plaintiff: Vanessa A Hopkins
Defendant: Jenkins Plumbing LLC, Pulte Homes of South Carolina Inc and Del Webb Communities Inc
Case Number: 9:2020cv01700
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Pulte Homes of South Carolina Inc, Del Webb Communities Inc Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 5/8/2020. (vdru, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Edward Alger on behalf of Vanessa A Hopkins (Alger, Neil)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by Del Webb Communities Inc, Pulte Homes of South Carolina Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Purchase Agreement Contract)No proposed order.(Dixon, Joshua)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jenkins Plumbing LLC.(Lucey, Emily)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Jenkins Plumbing LLC.(Lucey, Emily)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Del Webb Communities Inc, Pulte Homes of South Carolina Inc.(vdru, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jasper County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-27-00078. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9079138), filed by Del Webb Communities Inc, Pulte Homes of South Carolina Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B: Declaration of Eric Lundblad, #3 Certificate of Service)(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. Pulte Homes of South Carolina Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins Plumbing LLC
Represented By: Emily Gifford Lucey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulte Homes of South Carolina Inc
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Represented By: Joshua Wallace Dixon
Represented By: Brittany Tanya Bihun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Webb Communities Inc
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Represented By: Joshua Wallace Dixon
Represented By: Brittany Tanya Bihun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa A Hopkins
Represented By: Matthew V Creech
Represented By: Daniel E Henderson
Represented By: Neil Edward Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?