Medical Pavilion Inc et al v. Jonathan Arnell McNabb 2009 Irrevocable Trust, The et al
Plaintiff: Natasha Viswanathan Trust, The, Medical Pavilion Inc and Vijay Viswanathan Trust, The
Defendant: Millard V Oakley, Jonathan Arnell McNabb 2009 Irrevocable Trust, The, Garry W McNabb, Kendall Vaughn Smith 1999 Irrevocable Trust, The and Rachel Elizabeth McNabb 2009 Irrevocable Trust, The
Case Number: 9:2021cv00550
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM In the Alternative to Stay and Compel Arbitration Response filed by Millard V Oakley. (Coltrane, Curtis)
April 20, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM In the Alternative to Stay and Compel Arbitration Response filed by Kendall Vaughn Smith 1999 Irrevocable Trust, The. (Coltrane, Curtis)
April 20, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #18 Reply to Response to Motion, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: 2011 and 2019 K-1 Forms for McNabb Trusts, #2 Exhibit B: 2015 Emails Regarding Management Fees and Leasing Commissions, #3 Exhibit C: 2020 Email Acknowledging Arbitration Provision)(Baker, Charles) (Main Document 19 replaced on 4/21/2021) (sshe, ). Modified on 4/21/2021 to replace with corrected signature document as provided by filing user(sshe, ).
April 20, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Stay and Compel Arbitration Response filed by Jonathan Arnell McNabb 2009 Irrevocable Trust, The, Garry W McNabb, Rachel Elizabeth McNabb 2009 Irrevocable Trust, The. (Baker, Charles)
April 14, 2021 Filing 17 Amended RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Stay and Compel Arbitration Amended Response filed by Medical Pavilion Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/21/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Kuhn, Harold) Modified on 4/14/2021 to edit docket text(sshe, ).
April 13, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Medical Pavilion Inc. (Kuhn, Harold) (Main Document 16 replaced on 4/14/2021) (sshe, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2021: #1 Exhibit A Property Management Agreement) (sshe, ). Modified on 4/14/2021 to replace with corrected signature document provided by filing user, to add attachment document as requested and provided by filing user(sshe, ).
April 13, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Stay and Compel Arbitration Response filed by Medical Pavilion Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/20/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Kuhn, Harold)
April 13, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM In the Alternative to Stay and Compel Arbitration Response filed by Medical Pavilion Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/20/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Kuhn, Harold)
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time until 4/14/21 for Plaintiff's to file a responsive brief to the Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/5/21.(ltap, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Brief by Medical Pavilion Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/19/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Kuhn, Harold)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM In the Alternative to Stay and Compel Arbitration by Kendall Vaughn Smith 1999 Irrevocable Trust, The, Millard V Oakley. Response to Motion due by 4/14/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Coltrane, Curtis)
March 31, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Andrew Walden on behalf of Jonathan Arnell McNabb 2009 Irrevocable Trust, The, Garry W McNabb, Rachel Elizabeth McNabb 2009 Irrevocable Trust, The (Walden, Robert)
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay and Compel Arbitration by Jonathan Arnell McNabb 2009 Irrevocable Trust, The, Garry W McNabb, Rachel Elizabeth McNabb 2009 Irrevocable Trust, The. Response to Motion due by 4/5/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A -McNabb Trusts Certificates of Membership, #3 Exhibit B - Demand for Arbitration and Statement of Claim, #4 Exhibit C Articles of Organization Medical Pavilion of Hilton Head, LLC, #5 Exhibit D MPLLC Operating Agreement, #6 Exhibit E - 2011 Agreement)No proposed order.(Baker, Charles)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Medical Pavilion Inc. Kendall Vaughn Smith 1999 Irrevocable Trust, The served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Kuhn, Harold)
March 2, 2021 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Medical Pavilion Inc. Garry W McNabb served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Kuhn, Harold)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Medical Pavilion Inc, Natasha Viswanathan Trust, The, Vijay Viswanathan Trust, The.(sshe, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9666607.), filed by Natasha Viswanathan Trust, The, Medical Pavilion Inc, Vijay Viswanathan Trust, The. Service due by 5/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement)(sshe, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2021: #2 Exhibit Email) (sshe, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medical Pavilion Inc et al v. Jonathan Arnell McNabb 2009 Irrevocable Trust, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Viswanathan Trust, The
Represented By: P Benjamin Zuckerman
Represented By: Harold Fred Kuhn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medical Pavilion Inc
Represented By: P Benjamin Zuckerman
Represented By: Harold Fred Kuhn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vijay Viswanathan Trust, The
Represented By: P Benjamin Zuckerman
Represented By: Harold Fred Kuhn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millard V Oakley
Represented By: Curtis Lee Coltrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Arnell McNabb 2009 Irrevocable Trust, The
Represented By: Robert Andrew Walden
Represented By: Charles J Baker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry W McNabb
Represented By: Robert Andrew Walden
Represented By: Charles J Baker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall Vaughn Smith 1999 Irrevocable Trust, The
Represented By: Curtis Lee Coltrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Elizabeth McNabb 2009 Irrevocable Trust, The
Represented By: Robert Andrew Walden
Represented By: Charles J Baker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?