SD VOICE et al v. Noem et al

Plaintiff: SD VOICE and Cory Heidelberger
Defendant: Steve Barnett, Jason Ravnsborg and Kristi G. Noem
Case Number: 1:2019cv01003
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Motion Response re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE. (Leach, James)
April 26, 2019 Filing 27 Witness List by Steve Barnett, Kristi G. Noem, Jason Ravnsborg.(Hegge, Stacy)
April 24, 2019 Filing 26 Witness List by Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE.(Leach, James)
April 23, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION re: Exhibit by Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE. (Leach, James)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #21 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on April 23, 2019. (DLC)
April 22, 2019 Filing 23 Letter to Judge Kornmann. (Leach, James)
April 14, 2019 Filing 22 Letter to Judge Kornmann. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time) (Leach, James)
April 11, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE. (Leach, James)
April 10, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Kea Warne re #19 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-General Election Canvass, #2 Exhibit 2-Ballot Question Pamphlet, #3 Exhibit 3-Primary Ballot Question Pamphlet, #4 Exhibit 4-IM 24 Initiative Petition) (Hegge, Stacy)
April 10, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Hegge, Stacy)
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 Discovery Report Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting by Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE.(Leach, James)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Steve Barnett, Kristi G. Noem, Jason Ravnsborg. (Hegge, Stacy)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction set for 5/3/2019 at 10:30 AM in Aberdeen Courtroom 1 - Room 403* before U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 3/29/2019. (SLT)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Counsel)(SLT)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by SD VOICE, Cory Heidelberger. (Leach, James)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Plaintiffs Filing an Amended Complaint for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction signed by Plaintiffs Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE (the Consent is signed by Defendants' Attorney; the Amended Complaint is signed by Plaintiffs' Attorney). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint that defendants have consented may be filed) (Leach, James)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Steve Barnett, Kristi G. Noem, Jason Ravnsborg. (Hegge, Stacy)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #5 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,,,, Stipulation to Admission of Exhibits 1 to 10 at hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE. (Leach, James)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Admission of Service by Gov. Noem, #2 Exhibit Admission of Service by Atty. Genl. Ravnsborg, #3 Exhibit Admission of Service by Secty. of State Barnett)(Leach, James)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Hon. Charles B. Kornmann. (Hegge, Stacy)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy R. Hegge on behalf of Steve Barnett, Kristi G. Noem, Jason Ravnsborg. (Hegge, Stacy)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to Hon. Charles Kornmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit March 4, 2019 letter to SD AG Jason Ravnsborg, #2 Exhibit Mach 6, 2019 Summons and Proof of Service on SD Secty of State Barnett, #3 Exhibit March 7, 2019 e-mail to SD AG Jason Ravnsborg, #4 Exhibit March 12, 2019 e-mail to SD AG Jason Ravnsborg) (Leach, James)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE. (Leach, James)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit South Dakotans for Integrity Campaign Finance Disclose Report showing out-of-state contributions, #2 Exhibit South Dakotans for Integrity Campaign Finance Disclose Report showing additional out-of-state contributions, #3 Exhibit South Dakotans for Ethics Reform Campaign Finance Disclosure Reports showing out-of-state contributions, #4 Exhibit Represent South Dakota Campaign Finance Disclosure Reports showing out-of-state contributions, #5 Exhibit South Dakotans Against the Deceptive Rx Ballot Issue Campaign Finance Disclosure Reports showing out-of-state contributions, #6 Exhibit South Dakotans Against Higher Taxes Campaign Finance Disclosure Reports showing out-of-state contributions, #7 Exhibit Kristi for Governor Campaign Finance Disclosure Report showing out-of-state contributions, #8 Exhibit Jason for South Dakota Campaign Finance Disclosure Report showing out-of-state contributions, #9 Exhibit Mickelson for District 13 House 2016 Campaign Finance Disclosure Statement showing out-of-state contributions, #10 Exhibit SD VOICE Initiative Petition approved by Secretary of State for 2020 general election ballot) (Leach, James)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE. (Leach, James)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons in a Civil Action served on SD Secty of State Steve Barnett on 3/6/2019, filed by Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE. (Leach, James)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Steve Barnett, Kristi G. Noem, Jason Ravnsborg. Summons, Rule 73 memo, and AO85 delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(SLT)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX500005694) filed by SD VOICE, Cory Heidelberger. (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SD VOICE et al v. Noem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SD VOICE
Represented By: James D. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Heidelberger
Represented By: James D. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Barnett
Represented By: Stacy R. Hegge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Ravnsborg
Represented By: Stacy R. Hegge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi G. Noem
Represented By: Stacy R. Hegge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?