Misner v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Tamra Jean Misner
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv01009
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison J. Ramsdell on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Ramsdell, Alison)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 Certified Mail Receipt for service upon Office of General Counsel - Dallas (DLC)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #8 Summons Issued as to USA - IFP Cases, #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Acknowledgement filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Ryan, Diana)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 Certified Mail Receipt for service upon William Barr, Attorney General of the United States (DLC)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned for Ronald A. Parsons Jr. (SAC)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill in her official capacity. Original summons, AO 85, #1 Complaint delivered via certified mail to defendant. Delivered copies of summons(es), A0 85, #1 Complaint to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General via certified mail. (Attachments: #1 Rule 73 Memo for Plaintiff, #2 AO 85, #3 U.S. Postal Service Certified Mail Receipt)(DLC)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AND SERVE COMPLAINT WITHOUT THE PREPAYMENT OF FEES granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on May 17, 2019. (DLC)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 New Case LETTER with enclosed Docket Sheet sent by Clerk's Office to Tamra Jean Misner. (DLC)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN THE DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by Tamra Jean Misner. (DLC)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Affidavit in Support by Tamra Jean Misner. (DLC)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Electronic Notice by Tamra Jean Misner. Pro se party Tamra Jean Misner will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (DLC)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on Social Security Appeal filed by Tamra Jean Misner. (DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Misner v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamra Jean Misner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Alison J. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel - Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?