SD VOICE et al v. Noem et al
Plaintiff: SD VOICE and Cory Heidelberger
Defendant: Kristi L. Noem, Jason Ravnsborg and Steve Barnett
Case Number: 1:2019cv01017
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 Letter to Judge Kornman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Public Statements by Sponsor of HB 1094) (Leach, James)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 Telephone Conference held on 9/17/2019 before U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Hook) (DLC)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy R. Hegge on behalf of Steve Barnett, Kristi L. Noem, Jason Ravnsborg. (Hegge, Stacy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM LETTER. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 9/13/2019. (DJP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 FORM 52 REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting by Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE.(Leach, James)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter to counsel)(DJP)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Farris, Holly)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by AG Jason Ravnsborg for Secty of State Barnett Acknowledgement filed by Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE. (Leach, James)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by AG Jason Ravnsborg for himself Acknowledgement filed by Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE. (Leach, James)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by AG Jason Ravnsborg for Gov. Noem Acknowledgement filed by Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE. (Leach, James)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly R. Farris on behalf of All Defendants. (Farris, Holly)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunction filed by SD VOICE, Cory Heidelberger. (Leach, James)
August 2, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #3 Amended Complaint was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Leach, James)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT by Plaintiffs Cory Heidelberger, SD VOICE re #3 Amended Complaint for Permanent Injunction (Leach, James)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunction filed by SD VOICE, Cory Heidelberger. (Leach, James) Modified on 8/2/2019 (SLT).
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Steve Barnett, Kristi L. Noem, Jason Ravnsborg. Three Summmons(es), Rule 73 Memo and AO 85 form delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Noem Summons, #2 Ravnsborg Summons, #3 Barnett Summons, #4 AO85)(DJP)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunction ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX500005942) filed by SD VOICE, Cory Heidelberger. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SD VOICE et al v. Noem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SD VOICE
Represented By: James D. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Heidelberger
Represented By: James D. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi L. Noem
Represented By: Holly R. Farris
Represented By: Stacy R. Hegge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Ravnsborg
Represented By: Holly R. Farris
Represented By: Stacy R. Hegge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Barnett
Represented By: Holly R. Farris
Represented By: Stacy R. Hegge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?