Cormier et al v. Wientjes et al
Plaintiff: Peggy Cormier and Robert Cormier
Defendant: Wayne Kanyuh and Cody R. Wientjes
Case Number: 1:2019cv01021
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/2/2020 Motions due by 12/1/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2021 at 01:00 PM before U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 11/26/2019. (SAC)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 FORM 52 REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting by Robert Cormier.(Peterson, Greg)
November 26, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #11 Form 52 Report was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Peterson, Greg)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 (FILED IN ERROR) FORM 52 REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting by Robert Cormier.(Peterson, Greg) Modified on 11/26/2019 (CLR).
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Ralph J. Tease, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3191633) by Peggy Cormier, Robert Cormier. (Peterson, Greg)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 10/31/19. (Attachments: #1 Letter to counsel)(SKK)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to #5 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Wayne Kanyuh. (Williamson, Hilary) Modified on 10/31/2019 (CLR).
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Cody R. Wientjes by Wayne Kanyuh. (Williamson, Hilary)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Cormier, Peggy Cormier. Wayne Kanyuh waiver sent on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Peterson, Greg)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Wayne Kanyuh by Cody R. Wientjes. (Strommen, Gregory)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory G. Strommen on behalf of Cody R. Wientjes. (Strommen, Gregory)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Cody R. Wientjes on 10/08/2019 (Peterson, Greg)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wayne Kanyuh, Cody R. Wientjes. 2 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85 for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Cody R. Wientjes and Wayne Kanyuh, #2 AO85 Form)(SAC)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX300003327) filed by Robert Cormier, Peggy Cormier. (SAC) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/2/2019) (SAC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cormier et al v. Wientjes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Kanyuh
Represented By: Hilary L. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody R. Wientjes
Represented By: Gregory G. Strommen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Cormier
Represented By: Greg L. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cormier
Represented By: Greg L. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?