Nash et al v. Center Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kevin Nash and Crystal Nash
Defendant: Center Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01006
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/5/2020 Motions due by 10/26/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2020 at 01:00 PM in Aberdeen Courtroom 1 - Room 403* before U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 5/13/2020. (JLS)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 Discovery Report Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Conference by Crystal Nash, Kevin Nash.(Tysdal, Matthew)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Judge Kornmann to Counsel)(JLS)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Center Mutual Insurance Company. (Garry, William)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Center Mutual Insurance Company on April 7, 2020 (Tysdal, Matthew)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Center Mutual Insurance Company. 1 Summons, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Central Mutual Insurance Company, #2 AO85 form)(JLS)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3288152) filed by Kevin Nash, Crystal Nash. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nash et al v. Center Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Nash
Represented By: Vincent A. Purtell
Represented By: Matthew A. Tysdal
Represented By: Robert M. Ronayne
Represented By: Rebecca L. Ronayne
Represented By: Scott N. Heidepriem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Nash
Represented By: Vincent A. Purtell
Represented By: Matthew A. Tysdal
Represented By: Robert M. Ronayne
Represented By: Rebecca L. Ronayne
Represented By: Scott N. Heidepriem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: William C. Garry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?