Waliezer v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Shane D. Waliezer
Defendant: Jane Doe, Dawn Elshire, John Doe, Patrick MccMann, Marty Jackley and Jason Ravnsborg
Case Number: 1:2021cv01020
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re denying #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, granting #16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 10/06/2021. MAILING copy of Order and appeal packet to Shane Waliezer and MAILING copy of Order to Codington County Jail. (SAC)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Long Form) by Shane D. Waliezer. (DJP)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Mail sent to Shane Waliezer was returned as undeliverable. Docket Sheet was returned. Mailed to updated address. (MSB)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (MSB)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Shane D. Waliezer (VMM)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER Received from Plaintiff to Clerk of Courts requesting case documents.. (DJP)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER Received from Plaintiff to Clerk of Courts with attached Order Granting Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis from Western District of Washington. (DJP) (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/24/2021) (DJP).
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Shane D. Waliezer (DJP)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Shane D. Waliezer re #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (DJP)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER Received from Shane Waliezer re. status of pending motions. Docket Sheet sent on 09/21/2021. (MSB)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Shane D. Waliezer re #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983), adding Defendants Marty Jackley and Jason Ravnsborg (DJP)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (VMM)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint together with an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury. Although a new case has been opened, your application to proceed without prepayment of fees may be denied unless you return the enclosed Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.) Copy of docket sheet and Prisoner Trust Account Report sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (VMM)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Alternate Address by Shane D. Waliezer. (VMM)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Shane D. Waliezer. (VMM)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shane D. Waliezer. (VMM)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights with Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter) (VMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waliezer v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane D. Waliezer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Elshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick MccMann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Jackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Ravnsborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?