Barker v. Chrysler Capital et al
Plaintiff: James Barker
Defendant: Chrysler Capital, NCB Management Services, Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC, TransUnion, LLC and NCB Management Services
Case Number: 1:2021cv01031
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant NCB Management Services, Inc. by James Barker (Dawson, Jacob)
December 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Barker. (Dawson, Jacob)
December 10, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to DISMISS by NCB Management Services. (Christianson, Christopher)
December 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Barker. (Dawson, Jacob)
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by NCB Management Services . (Christianson, Christopher)
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion, LLC. (Breit, Robert)
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Breanna E. Robinson, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee previously paid by $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3674891) by TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Breit, Robert) Modified on 11/29/2021 (SLT).
November 29, 2021 NOTICE of Filing Error: #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Christianson, Christopher)
November 29, 2021 NOTICE of Filing Error: #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #6 Answer to Complaint was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Boomsma, Glenn)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by NCB Management Services. (Christianson, Christopher)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NCB Management Services. (Christianson, Christopher) Modified on 11/29/2021 (SLT).
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Christianson on behalf of NCB Management Services. (Christianson, Christopher)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion, LLC. (Boomsma, Glenn) Modified on 11/29/2021 (SLT).
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by James Barker of Settlement as to Defendants Chrysler Capital and Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Dawson, Jacob)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Attorney Breanna E. Robinson, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3674891) by TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Disclosure Statement) (Boomsma, Glenn) Modified on 11/29/2021 (SLT).
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendants Chrysler Capital, NCB Management Services, TransUnion, LLC on 11/05/2021 (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed, #2 Summons Returned Executed)(Dawson, Jacob)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 4 Summonses, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Chrysler Capital Santander Consumer USA, #2 Summons Issued - Equifax, #3 Summons Issued - NCB Management Services, Inc., #4 Summons Issued - Trans Union, LLC, #5 AO85 form)(JLS)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3656778, in shell case on 10/25/2021 filed by James Barker on 10/25/2021. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Chrysler Capital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Barker
Represented By: Jacob D. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCB Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Robert J Breit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCB Management Services
Represented By: Christopher A. Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?