Behm et al v. Schade et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Behm, Christopher Behm and Cottonwood Ranch, LLC
Defendant: Lance Schade, George Schade, Landon Schade, L&K Farms Inc., Schade Farms Inc. and Rocking S Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01013
Filed: September 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2022 Filing 25 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Schade Farms Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schade Farms, Inc. for Schade Farms Inc.. (Fuller, William)
October 21, 2022 Filing 24 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by L&K Farms Inc.. (Travis, Richard)
October 20, 2022 Filing 23 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Cottonwood Ranch, LLC. (Peterson, Mitchell)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 10/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Counsel)(CLR)
October 10, 2022 Filing 21 SEPARATE ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand L&K FARMS, INC., by Lance Schade. (Travis, Richard)
October 7, 2022 Filing 20 First Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by George Schade, Schade Farms Inc.. (Fuller, William)
October 6, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by George Schade, Schade Farms Inc.. (Fuller, William)
October 6, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney by George Schade, Schade Farms Inc.. Attorney Jack H. Hieb terminated. (Hieb, Jack)
September 30, 2022 Filing 17 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Rocking S Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rocking S Inc. for Rocking S Inc.. (Linde, Paul)
September 28, 2022 Filing 16 Notice of Time to File Answer pursuant to D.S.D. LR 12.1 re #1 Complaint by George Schade. (Fuller, William) Modified on 10/5/2022 to change event type, no motion required per chambers (KLE).
September 28, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William P. Fuller on behalf of George Schade. (Fuller, William)
September 28, 2022 Filing 14 SEPARATE ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rocking S Inc., Landon Schade. (Linde, Paul)
September 22, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul H. Linde on behalf of Rocking S Inc., Landon Schade. (Linde, Paul)
September 20, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by George Schade, Schade Farms Inc. Unopposed. (Hieb, Jack)
September 19, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack H. Hieb on behalf of George Schade, Schade Farms Inc.. (Hieb, Jack)
September 16, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Travis on behalf of L&K Farms Inc., Lance Schade. (Travis, Richard)
September 16, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Landon Schade on Landon Schade (Peterson, Mitchell)
September 16, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Rocking S Inc. on Paul J. Gillette as registered agent (Peterson, Mitchell)
September 16, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant L&K Farms Inc. on Paul J. Gillette as registered agent (Peterson, Mitchell)
September 16, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Schade Farms Inc. on George Schade as registered agent (Peterson, Mitchell)
September 16, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant George Schade on George Schade as Trustee for George Schade Trust Etux (Peterson, Mitchell)
September 16, 2022 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant George Schade on George Schade (Peterson, Mitchell)
September 16, 2022 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Lance Schade on Lance Schade (Peterson, Mitchell)
September 1, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to all Defendants. Summons, Rule 73 Memo and AO 85 delivered to Plaintiffs' counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued, #2 AO85)(DJP)
September 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3867450, in shell case on 9/1/2022 filed by Christopher Behm, Brenda Behm, Cottonwood Ranch, LLC on 9/1/2022. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Behm et al v. Schade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Behm
Represented By: Mitchell A. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Behm
Represented By: Mitchell A. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cottonwood Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell A. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Schade
Represented By: Richard L. Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Schade
Represented By: William P. Fuller
Represented By: Jack H. Hieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landon Schade
Represented By: Paul H. Linde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L&K Farms Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schade Farms Inc.
Represented By: William P. Fuller
Represented By: Jack H. Hieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocking S Inc.
Represented By: Paul H. Linde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?