Sisseton-Wahpeton Oyate of the Lake Traverse Reservation et al v. United States Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: Sisseton-Wahpeton Oyate of the Lake Traverse Reservation and Robert Shepherd
Defendant: United States Corps of Engineers, Robert J. Ruch and Steven E. Naylor
Case Number: 3:2011cv03026
Filed: November 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Central Division Office
County: Day
Presiding Judge: Roberto A. Lange
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING REMAINING ISSUES. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 9/29/16. (DJP)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 OPINION AND ORDER denying 73 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record ; denying 81 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 8/18/2015. (JLS)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 OPINION AND ORDER CONCERNING PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND SCHEDULING OF TRIAL. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 9/18/2014. (JLS)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U. S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 1/18/13. (DJP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sisseton-Wahpeton Oyate of the Lake Traverse Reservation et al v. United States Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sisseton-Wahpeton Oyate of the Lake Traverse Reservation
Represented By: Debra Caroline Flute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Shepherd
Represented By: Debra Caroline Flute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Ruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?