Heldt et al v. Payday Financial, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Chad Martin Heldt, Christi W. Jones, Sonja Curtis and Cheryl A. Martin
Defendant: Payday Financial, LLC, Western Sky Financial, LLC, Martin A. Webb and Cashcall, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv03023
Filed: July 11, 2013
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Central Division Office
County: Dewey
Presiding Judge: Roberto A. Lange
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2016 119 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Lifting Stay and denying 64 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. Motions terminated: 64 Joint MOTION for Settlement to Lift Stay and for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement filed by Christi W. Jones, Chad Martin Heldt, Sonja Curtis, Cheryl A. Martin. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 1/8/2016. (JLS)
December 15, 2015 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 91 Motion to Intervene filed by Thomas Brown, Monica Johnson, Melinda Long, Debera Grant, Renee Holmes, Kevin Hayes, James Hayes, Leslie Jan Lydon, Elizabeth Jackson, Abraham Inetianbor, James Binkowski, Jeffrey Moore, Lisa Walker, Herbert White. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/15/15. (SLW)
March 31, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS denying 34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, granting in part and denying in part 26 MOTION to Stay, and granted in part and denying in part 23 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 3/31/14. (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heldt et al v. Payday Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Martin Heldt
Represented By: Wade Lee Fischer
Represented By: Christopher D. Jozwiak
Represented By: Cheryl F. Laurenz-Bogue
Represented By: Shawn J. Wanta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christi W. Jones
Represented By: Wade Lee Fischer
Represented By: Christopher D. Jozwiak
Represented By: Cheryl F. Laurenz-Bogue
Represented By: Shawn J. Wanta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Curtis
Represented By: Wade Lee Fischer
Represented By: Christopher D. Jozwiak
Represented By: Cheryl F. Laurenz-Bogue
Represented By: Shawn J. Wanta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl A. Martin
Represented By: Wade Lee Fischer
Represented By: Christopher D. Jozwiak
Represented By: Cheryl F. Laurenz-Bogue
Represented By: Shawn J. Wanta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payday Financial, LLC
Represented By: Cheryl F. Laurenz-Bogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Sky Financial, LLC
Represented By: Cheryl F. Laurenz-Bogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin A. Webb
Represented By: Cheryl F. Laurenz-Bogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cashcall, Inc.
Represented By: Cheryl F. Laurenz-Bogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?