Lindholm et al v. BMW of North America, LLC

Plaintiff: Bruce Lindholm and Vanoosheh Lindholm
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv03003
Filed: February 12, 2015
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Central Division Office
County: Hughes
Presiding Judge: Roberto A. Lange
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 8/17/2016. (JLS)
April 25, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 38 Motion to Compel; denying 38 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 38 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 04/25/2016. (LH)
February 5, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Compel. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 2/5/2016. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindholm et al v. BMW of North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Lindholm
Represented By: Mark A. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanoosheh Lindholm
Represented By: Mark A. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?