Frazier v. Douville et al
Plaintiff: Harold C. Frazier
Defendant: Gina Douville, Cheyenne River Agency and Bureau of Indian Affairs
Case Number: 3:2018cv03018
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/20/2018. (LH)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Harold C. Frazier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Rebecca Kidder)(Kidder, Rebecca)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Kidder on behalf of Harold C. Frazier. (Kidder, Rebecca)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Kara Pfister re #3 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Donovan, SaraBeth)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bureau of Indian Affairs, Cheyenne River Agency, Gina Douville. (Donovan, SaraBeth)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bureau of Indian Affairs, Cheyenne River Agency, Gina Douville. (Donovan, SaraBeth)
October 15, 2018 Rule 73 Memo and 4 AO85s delivered to AUSA via hand delivery in RC. (SLT)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLT)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bureau of Indian Affairs, Cheyenne River Agency, Gina Douville from Cheyenne River Sioux Tribal Court, case number 18C084.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cheyenne River Sioux Trial Court Complaint and Summons)(SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Douville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Douville
Represented By: SaraBeth Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheyenne River Agency
Represented By: SaraBeth Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Indian Affairs
Represented By: SaraBeth Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold C. Frazier
Represented By: Rebecca L. Kidder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?