Taylor et al v. Haugaard

Plaintiff: South Dakota Municipal League and Yvonne Taylor
Defendant: Steven Haugaard
Case Number: 3:2019cv03003
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 1/25/2019 at 2:25 p.m. (SLT)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Williams on behalf of Steven Haugaard. (Williams, Richard)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Attorney General Acknowledgement filed by Yvonne Taylor. (Frankenstein, Sara)
January 23, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Pierre Courtroom 1 - Room 436 before U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange (LH)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lust, David)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- May 2018 Column, #2 Exhibit B - Letter to Speaker, #3 Exhibit C- Chapter 74 Public Order) (Lust, David)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Yvonne Taylor. (Lust, David)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Steven Haugaard. 1 original summons, 1 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO85)(SLT)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-2967948) filed by Yvonne Taylor, South Dakota Municipal League in shell case on 1/22/2019. (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. Haugaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Dakota Municipal League
Represented By: David E. Lust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Taylor
Represented By: David E. Lust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Haugaard
Represented By: Richard M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?