Hoffman et al v. Case IH Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: Kandice Hoffman and Rodney Hoffman
Defendant: Case IH Agriculture and West Plains, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv03004
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Contract: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Case IH Agriculture. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Protective Order) (Anderson, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/13/2019; Motions due by 1/3/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 03/15/2019. (LH)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 Discovery Report by Rodney Hoffman.(Erickson, Joseph)
March 12, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #13 Discovery Report was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Erickson, Joseph)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 (FILED IN ERROR) Discovery Report by Rodney Hoffman.(Schoenbeck, Lee) Modified on 3/13/2019 (SLT).
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frank S. Carson. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 03/06/2019. (LH)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Maureen A. Bickley. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 03/06/2019. (LH)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Frank S. Carson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3004796) by Case IH Agriculture. (Anderson, Robert)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Maureen A. Bickley to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3004776) by Case IH Agriculture. (Anderson, Robert)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Case IH Agriculture. (Anderson, Robert)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 02/05/2019. (LH)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Case IH Agriculture by West Plains, Inc. (Stalley, Cassidy)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by West Plains, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Plains Ag LLC for West Plains, Inc. (Stalley, Cassidy)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassidy M. Stalley on behalf of West Plains, Inc. (Stalley, Cassidy)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Case IH Agriculture. (Anderson, Robert)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Anderson on behalf of Case IH Agriculture. (JLS)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Case IH Agriculture from Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, County of Ziebach, State of South Dakota, case number 67 CIV 19-2. ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX300003081) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint filed in State Court)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman et al v. Case IH Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kandice Hoffman
Represented By: Lee A. Schoenbeck
Represented By: Joseph B. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Hoffman
Represented By: Lee A. Schoenbeck
Represented By: Joseph B. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case IH Agriculture
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Represented By: Maureen A. Bickley
Represented By: Frank S. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Plains, Inc
Represented By: Cassidy M. Stalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?