Nygaard v. Taylor et al
Petitioner: Aarin Nygaard
Respondent: Todd Waldo, Ed Ducheneaux, Brenda Claymore, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribal Court, Jessica Ducheneaux, Ted Taylor, Jr., The South Dakota Department of Social Services, Frank Pommersheim, Jenny Farlee and Tricia Taylor
Case Number: 3:2019cv03016
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah A. Aaberg. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 09/10/2019. (LH)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tracy J. Lyson. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 09/10/2019. (LH)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Sarah A. Aaberg to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3148860) by Aarin Nygaard. (Jackley, Martin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney Tracy J. Lyson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3148854) by Aarin Nygaard. (Jackley, Martin)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 73 MEMO. (Attachments: #1 AO 85)(SLT)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PURSUANT TO 24 U.S.C.A. 1303, ($400 fee paid, receipt# SDX3000003267) filed by Aarin Nygaard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint (Aarin), #2 Exhibit 2 Answer and Counterclaim 4-17-14, #3 Exhibit 3 Notice of Motion and Motion for Temp Relief 5-6-14, #4 Exhibit 4 Petition for Protection Relief 7-8-14, #5 Exhibit 5 Mutual No Contact Order, #6 Exhibit 6 Stipulation (signed), #7 Exhibit 7 Interim Order- 7-24-14 (Aarin), #8 Exhibit 8 Application for DVPO against Aarin 9-2-14 (tribal court), #9 Exhibit 9 Order for DVRO, #10 Exhibit 10 Order of Dismissal - Tribal Temp Protection Order, #11 Exhibit 11 Application for Ex Parte Order 9-9-14, #12 Exhibit 12 NOM and Motion for Contempt 9-9-14, #13 Exhibit 13 Ex Parte Order, #14 Exhibit 14 (Tribe's Ex C)-40718, #15 Exhibit 15 Amended Interim Order 10-3-14, #16 Exhibit 16 Bench Warrant 10-20-14, #17 Exhibit 17-40719, #18 Exhibit 18 Amended Information Charging Tricia, #19 Exhibit 19 Warrant for Tricia's Arrest, #20 Exhibit 20 (Tribe's Ex E)-40720, #21 Exhibit 21 Terrance's Dissolution Stip, #22 Exhibit 22 Child Support Order, #23 Exhibit 23 (pages 88-95) Stanley Pleadings 09-2014-DM-00898, #24 Exhibit 24 Application for Ex Parte Order 10.7.14, #25 Exhibit 25 ex parte order 10.8.14, #26 Exhibit 26 Amended Ex Parte Order 10-24-14, #27 Exhibit 27 Interim Order 11-19-2014, #28 Exhibit 28 Order on Contempt Feb 20 2015, #29 Exhibit 29 1st Notice of Appeal, #30 Exhibit 30 First Appellate Brief with Exhibits, #31 Exhibit 31 Tricia's Criminal Judgment, #32 Exhibit 32 First Appellate Court Order, #33 Exhibit 33 Summons - Child custody hrg (Aarin), #34 Exhibit 34 2nd Motion to Dismiss and Request for Hearing CRSTC and Exhibits, #35 Exhibit 35 Nygaard - Amended Order on Contempt 6-25-15, #36 Exhibit 36 Nygaard - Notice of Hearing 6-27-15, #37 Exhibit 37 Tribal Order of Continuance 08.28.15, #38 Exhibit 38 Nygaard - Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment 9-4-15, #39 Exhibit 39 Amended Findings of Fact (signed), #40 Exhibit 40 Nygaard - Judgment 9-21-15, #41 Exhibit 41 Stanley - Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment 9-4-15, #42 Exhibit 42 Stanley - Judgment 9-24-15, #43 Exhibit 43 Order for Contintuance 09.18.15 (also indicating PKPA does not apply), #44 Exhibit 44 Expedited Request for Renewed Order on Contempt and Terrance's Motion for Contempt, #45 Exhibit 45 Order on Contempt (RENEWED) - AMENDED BY SOLHEIM and Terrance's Order on Contempt, #46 Exhibit 46 Interlocutory Orders 10-26-15, #47 Exhibit 47 Order Dismissing Challenge to Jurisdiction, #48 Exhibit 48 Nygaard - Second Amended Order on Contempt and Order to Incarcerate or Arrest 11-3-15, #49 Exhibit 49 Nygaard - Sheriff's Return Served 11-5-15 and Stanley's Sheriff's Return, #50 Exhibit 50 Nygaard - Order 1-19-16, #51 Exhibit 51 Stanley - Order 1-19-16, #52 Exhibit 52 2nd Notice of Appeal 01.19.16, #53 Exhibit 53 2nd Appellant Brief 03.15.16, #54 Exhibit 54 2nd Appeal Notification of Oral Arguments 06.08.16, #55 Exhibit 55 CRSTCA 9-1-2016, #56 Exhibit 56 Request for Evidentiary Hearing 9-20-16-40503, #57 Exhibit 57 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 11-10-16, #58 Exhibit 58 Motion to Stay, #59 Exhibit 59 ND Federal Court Order-38612, #60 Exhibit 60 CRSTCA Order 7-20-17-40717, #61 Exhibit 61 CRSTC Order 8-3-17-40715, #62 Exhibit 62 Order - 4-24-18 - Judge Shanley-40721, #63 Exhibit 63 Tribal Resolution 171-2018-CR-40724, #64 Exhibit 64 September 24, 2018 CRSTCA Order-40723, #65 Exhibit 65 CRSTCA Order 2-25-2019-40716, #66 Exhibit 66 - Eberhard v. Eberhard-9650, #67 Exhibit 67 - Tricia's Arrest Warrant, #68 Exhibit 68 - 12-18-18 CRSTC Findings, #69 Exhibit 69 - Petition for Writ of Mandamus, #70 Exhibit 70 - Order to Continue 12-30-16, #71 Exhibit 71 - CRSTC Order nunc pro tunc 1-11-17, #72 Proposed Order) (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nygaard v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd Waldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ed Ducheneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brenda Claymore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cheyenne River Sioux Tribal Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jessica Ducheneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ted Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The South Dakota Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Frank Pommersheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jenny Farlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tricia Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aarin Nygaard
Represented By: Martin J. Jackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?