Deiter v. XL Specialty Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Larry Deiter
Defendant: XL Specialty Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03009
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court on the Basis of Abstention filed by Larry Deiter. (Sanford, Steven)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court on the Basis of Abstention by Larry Deiter. (Sanford, Steven)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Larry Deiter. (Sanford, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by XL Specialty Insurance Co.. (Haigh, Mark)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by XL Specialty Insurance Co.. (Haigh, Mark)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by XL Specialty Insurance Co. of Unopposed Additional Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. (Haigh, Mark)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by XL Specialty Insurance Co. of Unopposed Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. (Haigh, Mark)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Haigh on behalf of XL Specialty Insurance Co.. (Haigh, Mark)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by XL Specialty Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance American Inc., Corporate Parent AXA Assurance Vie Mutuelle, Other Affiliate X.L. American, Inc., Other Affiliate XL Bermuda Ltd., Other Affiliate Exel Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate XLIT Ltd., Other Affiliate AXA SA for XL Specialty Insurance Co.. (Evans, Edwin)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by XL Specialty Insurance Co. to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Evans, Edwin)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by XL Specialty Insurance Co. from Sixth Judicial Circuit Court, case number 32CIV20-000026. ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3279775) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Other Relief, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Action Docket Summary)(CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deiter v. XL Specialty Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Specialty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Edwin E. Evans
Represented By: Mark W. Haigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Deiter
Represented By: Steven W. Sanford
Represented By: Frank A. Marnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?