Lee et al v. Hall
Plaintiff: C.J.J. and Angel Mae Lee
Defendant: Francine Hall
Case Number: 3:2020cv03010
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney as to Francine Hall. Attorney Delia M. Druley (USA) added. Attorney SaraBeth Donovan terminated. (Druley (USA), Delia)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR RESPONSE TO PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 04/29/2020. (LH) Modified: mailed to Angel Mae Lee on 4/29/2020 (JLS).
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of SaraBeth Donovan re #4 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction; MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ryan Declaration, #2 Exhibit Pollack Declaration, #3 Exhibit Deguara Declaration) (Donovan, SaraBeth)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction; MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Francine Hall. (Donovan, SaraBeth)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Francine Hall. (Donovan, SaraBeth)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Francine Hall. (Donovan, SaraBeth)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Party by Francine Hall. (Donovan, SaraBeth)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Francine Hall from Cheyenne River Sioux Tribal Court, case number Civ. No. 20R017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Francine Hall, #2 Exhibit 2: Scope Certification of United States Attorney)(SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.J.J.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Mae Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francine Hall
Represented By: SaraBeth Donovan
Represented By: Delia M. Druley (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?