Estes et al v. Hughes County, South Dakota et al
Plaintiff: Valerie Estes and Estate of Seryl Leroy Pomani
Defendant: Julie Cox, Defendant Does 1-5, Mike Leidholt, Hughes County, South Dakota, Jaclyn Lowitz and Bill Dodge
Case Number: 3:2020cv03013
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Anderson on behalf of Bill Dodge, Hughes County, South Dakota, Mike Leidholt. (Anderson, Robert)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Abraham on behalf of Bill Dodge, Hughes County, South Dakota, Mike Leidholt. (Abraham, Douglas)
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed MIKE LEIDHOLT Acknowledgement filed by Valerie Estes. (Pochop, Stephanie)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed BILL DODGE Acknowledgement filed by Valerie Estes. (Pochop, Stephanie)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed JULIE COX Acknowledgement filed by Valerie Estes. (Pochop, Stephanie)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed HUGHES COUNTY Acknowledgement filed by Valerie Estes. (Pochop, Stephanie)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Frances Crockett Carpenter for Estate of Seryl Leroy Pomani,Frances Crockett Carpenter for Valerie Estes. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 08/26/2020. (MSB)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 1 Summons delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (SAC)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Frances Crockett Carpenter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3379518) by Estate of Seryl Leroy Pomani. (Pochop, Stephanie)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Amended Summons by Plaintiff Estate of Seryl Leroy Pomani (Pochop, Stephanie)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Estate of Seryl Leroy Pomani. (Pochop, Stephanie)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier for all further proceedings. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/30/20. (SLW)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange recused. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 07/22/2020. (LH)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Julie Cox, Bill Dodge, Hughes County, South Dakota, Mike Leidholt, Jaclyn Lowitz. 5 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summonses Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3351810) filed by Estate of Seryl Leroy Pomani, Valerie Estes. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estes et al v. Hughes County, South Dakota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Leidholt
Represented By: Douglas A. Abraham
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes County, South Dakota
Represented By: Douglas A. Abraham
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaclyn Lowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Dodge
Represented By: Douglas A. Abraham
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Estes
Represented By: Stephanie E. Pochop
Represented By: Frances Crockett Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Seryl Leroy Pomani
Represented By: Stephanie E. Pochop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?