Engel v. Engel et al
Plaintiff: Seneca Lovett Engel
Defendant: Derek Engel, Miller Police Department, City of Miller, South Dakota, Jim Henson, Shannon Speck and Various John and Jane Does
Case Number: 3:2021cv03020
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Referring Judge: Mark A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Miller, South Dakota, Jim Henson, Miller Police Department, Shannon Speck, Various John and Jane Does. (Marso, Lisa)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Derek Engel answer due 1/10/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/1/2021. (DJP) Mailed to Derek Engel on 12/1/2021 (DJP).
November 30, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by City of Miller, South Dakota, Jim Henson, Miller Police Department, Shannon Speck, Various John and Jane Does. (Marso, Lisa)
November 30, 2021 Filing 12 REGISTRATION for Electronic Notice by Derek Engel. Pro se party Derek Engel will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (DJP)
November 30, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Derek Engel. (DJP)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/24/2021. (MSB)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Miller, South Dakota, Jim Henson, Miller Police Department, Shannon Speck, Various John and Jane Does. (Marso, Lisa)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Shannon Speck served on Shannon Speck. (Volesky, Tucker)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Derek Engel served on Derek Engel. (Volesky, Tucker)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Jim Henson served on Jim Henson. (Volesky, Tucker)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE as to City of Miller, South Dakota served on Ron Blachford, Mayor. (Volesky, Tucker)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Derek Engel, Jim Henson, Miller Police Department, Shannon Speck. 4 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Engel Summons, #2 Hensen Summons, #3 Miller PD Summons, #4 Speck Summons, #5 AO85)(MSB)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS (Engel vs. Engel). (Volesky, Tucker) Modified to change event from Shell Case event on 10/29/2021 (MSB).
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Seneca Lovett Engel. (DJP)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed in shell case on 10/19/2021 filed by Seneca Lovett Engel on 10/19/2021. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engel v. Engel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seneca Lovett Engel
Represented By: Tucker J. Volesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Police Department
Represented By: Lisa Hansen Marso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Miller, South Dakota
Represented By: Lisa Hansen Marso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Henson
Represented By: Lisa Hansen Marso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Speck
Represented By: Lisa Hansen Marso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various John and Jane Does
Represented By: Lisa Hansen Marso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?