Teri Arcoren v. Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. et. al.
Plaintiff: TERI ARCOREN
Defendant: DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC. doing business as DEPUY SYNTHES JOINT RECONSTRUCTION, Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC., DEPUY, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES, INC., Depuy Ireland Unlimited Company, DEPUY SYNTHES JOHNSON & JOHNSON IRELAND LTD., Johnson & Johnson and Depuy Mitek, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv03011
Filed: June 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Central Division Office
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Referring Judge: Mark A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2023 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by All Defendants. (Parsons, Ronald)
July 17, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for More Definite Statement by DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY SYNTHES JOHNSON & JOHNSON IRELAND LTD., DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES, INC., DEPUY, INC., Depuy Ireland Unlimited Company, Depuy Mitek, Inc., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC., Johnson & Johnson, MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.. (Parsons, Ronald)
July 17, 2023 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY SYNTHES JOHNSON & JOHNSON IRELAND LTD., DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES, INC., DEPUY, INC., Depuy Ireland Unlimited Company, Depuy Mitek, Inc., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC., Johnson & Johnson, MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.. (Parsons, Ronald)
July 17, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald A. Parsons, Jr on behalf of All Defendants. (Parsons, Ronald)
July 17, 2023 Filing 8 (Filed in Error) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY SYNTHES JOHNSON & JOHNSON IRELAND LTD., DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES, INC., DEPUY, INC., Depuy Ireland Unlimited Company, Depuy Mitek, Inc., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC., Johnson & Johnson, MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.. (Parsons, Ronald) Modified on 7/18/2023 (VMM).
July 17, 2023 Filing 7 (Filed in Error) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald A. Parsons, Jr on behalf of All Defendants. (Parsons, Ronald) Modified on 7/18/2023 (VMM).
July 17, 2023 NOTICE of Filing Error: #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #7 Notice of Appearance was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Parsons, Ronald)
June 15, 2023 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:22-cv-06603. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 15, 2023 CLERK'S TEXT LETTER TO NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY(S) Local Rule 83.2 (E) allows attorneys to appear pro hac vice (PHV) if they associate with local counsel. The rule provides, in relevant part, that '[a]n attorney who is not a member of the bar of this court, but who is a member in good standing of the bar of another United States District Court, may, upon motion and approval by the court, participate in the conduct of a particular case, but such motion may be allowed only if the applicant associates with a member in good standing of the bar of this court as local counsel.' Local counsel must sign and file all documents, and must be present in court during all proceedings unless otherwise ordered. The court's local rules are available on the district court's website located at www.sdd.uscourts.gov.To apply for admission PHV, complete the Motion for Admission PHV form found on our website under 'Local Forms' and submit it to local counsel for electronic filing. The PHV fee is $100. Local counsel may pay the fee electronically by using Pay.gov.Docket sheet mailed/emailed to non-resident attorney(s) NICHOLAS ROCCO FARNOLO Napoli Shkolnik 400 Broadhollow Road Suite 305 Melville, NY 11747 and MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY BARNES & THORNBURG LLP 1776 ON THE GREEN 67 EAST PARK PLACE MORRISTOWN, NJ 07960-7138 (SAC) Modified on 6/15/2023 (SAC).
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #3 Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of South Dakota ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/13/2023. (kht) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2023.]
April 5, 2023 Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day added. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman no longer assigned to case. (in-cmk) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2023.]
February 27, 2023 Filing 4 Letter from Michael C. Zogby re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of South Dakota . (ZOGBY, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2023.]
January 31, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of South Dakota by DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY IRELAND UNLIMITED COMPANY, DEPUY MITEK, INC., DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES JOHNSON & JOHNSON IRELAND LTD., DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES, INC., DEPUY, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC., MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2023.]
January 31, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of South Dakota . Motion set for 3/6/2023 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2023.]
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY IRELAND UNLIMITED COMPANY, DEPUY MITEK, INC., DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES JOHNSON & JOHNSON IRELAND LTD., DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES, INC., DEPUY, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC., MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (kht) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DEPUY IRELAND UNLIMITED COMPANY, DEPUY MITEK, INC., DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES JOHNSON & JOHNSON IRELAND LTD., DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES, INC., DEPUY, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC., MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13827478) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TERI ARCOREN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(FARNOLO, NICHOLAS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/15/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teri Arcoren v. Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERI ARCOREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC. doing business as DEPUY SYNTHES JOINT RECONSTRUCTION
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY, INC.
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY SYNTHES, INC.
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Ireland Unlimited Company
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUY SYNTHES JOHNSON & JOHNSON IRELAND LTD.
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Mitek, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?