Rutledge v. United States of America
Plaintiff: James P. Rutledge
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2023cv03018
Filed: August 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by United States of America (Kelderman, Eric)
September 11, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE WAIVER signed by James P. Rutledge. (MSB)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE WAIVER. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 8/29/2023. Mailed order and waiver to Plaintiff 8/29/2023.(DJP)
August 28, 2023 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Order for Responsive Affidavits filed by United States of America. (Kelderman, Eric)
August 28, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Order for Responsive Affidavits by United States of America. (Kelderman, Eric)
August 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Kelderman on behalf of United States of America. (Kelderman, Eric)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND REQUIRING RESPONSE. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 08/22/2023. Sent to Movant via USPS.(MSB)
August 4, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. (MSB) Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Pursuant to the E-Government Act and D.S.D. Civ. LR 5.2, you must redact personal identifiers from documents submitted to the Court. The Clerks Office will not review for compliance. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute.
August 4, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28:2255 Criminal Case No.: 20-cr-30144 filed by James P. Rutledge. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Ineffective Assistance of Counsel Document, #2 Attachment 2 - Probable Cause Document) (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutledge v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Koliner
Represented By: Eric D. Kelderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?