Agtegra Cooperative v. Over XXI, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Agtegra Cooperative
Defendant: Over XXI, Inc., Sacramento Energy Resources, L.L.C. and Pico Propane Operating, L.L.C. doing business as Pico Propane and Fuels
Case Number: 3:2023cv03032
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Referring Judge: Mark A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/30/2024. Motions due by 12/15/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 1/26/24. (SKK) Modified on 1/26/2024 (SKK).
January 25, 2024 Filing 16 Discovery Report by Agtegra Cooperative.(Theesfeld, Steven)
December 29, 2023 Filing 15 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Over XXI, Inc.. (Gray, John)
December 28, 2023 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Pico Propane Operating, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Meritum Energy Holdings, LP for Pico Propane Operating, L.L.C.. (Hale, William)
December 22, 2023 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Sacramento Energy Resources, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Sacramento Energy Resources, L.L.C. for Sacramento Energy Resources, L.L.C.. (Redd, Ryan)
December 22, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Separate Answer of Sacramento Energy Resources, L.L.C. to Amended Complaint by Sacramento Energy Resources, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sacramento Energy Resources, LLC General Terms and Conditions Liquid Petroleum Gas)(Redd, Ryan)
December 22, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan W.W. Redd on behalf of Sacramento Energy Resources, L.L.C.. (Redd, Ryan)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/21/23. (SKK)
December 20, 2023 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Sacramento Energy Resources, L.L.C. on 11/30/2023 (Theesfeld, Steven)
December 20, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Separate Answer of Sacramento Energy Resources, L.L.C. to Amended Complaint by Sacramento Energy Resources, L.L.C.. (Haigh, Mark)
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Over XXI, Inc.. (Gray, John)
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William Hale on behalf of Pico Propane Operating, L.L.C.. (Hale, William)
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Pico Propane Operating, L.L.C.. (Hale, William)
December 5, 2023 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Over XXI, Inc. on 11/13/2023 (Theesfeld, Steven)
December 5, 2023 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Sacramento Energy Resources, L.L.C. on 11/13/2023 (Theesfeld, Steven)
December 5, 2023 Filing 2 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Pico Propane Operating, L.L.C. on 11/20/2023 (Theesfeld, Steven)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Over XXI, Inc. from Sixth Judicial Circuit, case number 42CIV23-000020. ($402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4172382) (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(SKK) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/30/2023) (SKK).
November 30, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agtegra Cooperative v. Over XXI, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agtegra Cooperative
Represented By: Steven L. Theesfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Over XXI, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento Energy Resources, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark W. Haigh
Represented By: Ryan W.W. Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pico Propane Operating, L.L.C. doing business as Pico Propane and Fuels
Represented By: William Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?