Johnson v. Bad Boy Productions Holdings Inc et al
Plaintiff: Robert W. Johnson
Defendant: Diageo PLC, Bad Boy Productions Holdings Inc and Time Warner Inc
Case Number: 3:2024cv03023
Filed: October 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Camela C Theeler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert W. Johnson. (KLE)
October 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Financial Affidavit or Pay Filing Fee and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Show Cause Response due by 11/21/2024.) Signed by U.S. District Judge Camela C. Theeler on 10/22/2024. (Mailed to Robert Johnson with AO239)(JLS)
October 9, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with an Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Pursuant to the E-Government Act and D.S.D. Civ. LR 5.2, you must redact personal identifiers from documents submitted to the Court. The Clerks Office will not review for compliance. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed of the plaintiff's address changes, including changes to primary and secondary email addresses. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (JLS)
October 9, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Johnson. (JLS)
October 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT,, filed by Robert Johnson. (JLS)
October 9, 2024 CLERK'S TEXT LETTER TO NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY(S) Local Rule 83.2 (E) allows attorneys to appear pro hac vice (PHV) if they associate with local counsel. The rule provides, in relevant part, that '[a]n attorney who is not a member of the bar of this court, but who is a member in good standing of the bar of another United States District Court, may, upon motion and approval by the court, participate in the conduct of a particular case, but such motion may be allowed only if the applicant associates with a member in good standing of the bar of this court as local counsel.' Local counsel must sign and file all documents, and must be present in court during all proceedings unless otherwise ordered. The court's local rules are available on the district court's website located at www.sdd.uscourts.gov.To apply for admission PHV, complete the Motion for Admission PHV form found on our website under 'Local Forms' and submit it to local counsel for electronic filing. The PHV fee is $200. Local counsel may pay the fee electronically by using Pay.gov.Docket sheet mailed to non-resident attorney. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Bad Boy Productions Holdings Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diageo PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bad Boy Productions Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?