Berg v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Deane Berg
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Luzenac America, Inc., Rio Tinto Minerals, Inc., John/Jane Does and Unknown Businesses and/or Corporations A-Z
Case Number: 4:2009cv04179
Filed: December 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER denying 332 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 334 Motion for New Trial. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/30/2014. (KC)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER denying 308 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/19/2013. (KC)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER denying 246 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 09/12/2013. (KC)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER denying 140 Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part 143 Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion to Exclude; denying 147 Motion to Exclude; denying 149 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 151 Motion to Exclude; denying 153 Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion to Exclude. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/12/2013. (KC)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/25/2013. (KC)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 109 Motion to Quash; denying as moot 114 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/19/2012. (KC)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 9 Motion to Dismiss; granting 23 Motion for Joinder and denying motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 09/21/2010. (KC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deane Berg
Represented By: Gregory Alan Eiesland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luzenac America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Tinto Minerals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Businesses and/or Corporations A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?