Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Maule et al
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Defendant: Theresa Maule, Crow Creek Sioux Tribal Court and Native American Telecom, LLC.
Case Number: 4:2010cv04110
Filed: August 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/4/16. (SLW)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 256 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 258 Motion for Summary Judgment on Count One of its Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 268 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 273 Motion to Compel. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/26/2016. (JLS)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 211 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 223 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/7/2015. (KC)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 181 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/1/2015. (KC)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER overruling 209 OBJECTION to 208 Magistrate Judge Order by Native American Telecom, LLC. filed by Native American Telecom, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/19/2015. (KC)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER denying Sprint's 183 Motion to Compel; granting Sprint's 199 Motion for Leave to take limited discovery; and denying Native American Telecom's 201 Motion for a Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 01/14/15. (Duffy, Veronica)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 121 Motion to Stay; granting 124 Motion to Stay; denying 136 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/22/2012. (KC)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/14/11. (JMM)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying 67 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot 110 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/31/2011. (KC)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER denying in part and granting in part 92 MOTION to Compel NAT's Response to Discovery filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P. Order direcing parties to submit protective order. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/17/2011. (KC)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER denying 89 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion to Compel. NAT is to submit documents to court by 5/2/2011. Parties have until 4/26/2011, to depose Thomas Reiman. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/19/2011. (KC)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 37 Motion to Strike; denying 14 Motion to Stay; granting 20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/1/2010. (KC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Maule et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Represented By: Kathryn E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Maule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crow Creek Sioux Tribal Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Native American Telecom, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?