Hurley v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Willard Hurley
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2010cv04165
Filed: November 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that affidavits be disclosed by defendants to Hurley by 2/11/2013. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/30/2013. (KC)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying 52 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/3/2012. (KC)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that the parties will depose Judith Penzler, Steve Ladig, Teresa Herrera, and Jody Anderson for the limited purpose of determining the basis for the increased payments to Hurley. Defendants will pay plaintiff's out-of-pocket expenses for these depositions. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/11/2012. (KC)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 26 Motion; granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Compel; denying 32 Motion to Continue. Defendants to submit to court for in camera review proper privilege log by 5/22/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/7/2012. (KC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurley v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willard Hurley
Represented By: Scott A. Abdallah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: William P. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: William P. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?