Hansen Manufacturing Corp. v. Enduro Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Hansen Manufacturing Corp.
Defendant: Enduro Systems, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Enduro Systems, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Hansen Manufacturing Corp.
Case Number: 4:2011cv04030
Filed: February 28, 2011
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 92 Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion to Amend/Correct. Second supplemental and amended complaint due 2/14/2014. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/29/2014. (KC)
November 14, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion to Amend/Correct without prejudice. Signed by US Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 11/14/11. (DJP)
February 6, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion to Stay; denying 44 Motion for Leave to amend. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/6/2012. (KC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen Manufacturing Corp. v. Enduro Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hansen Manufacturing Corp.
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela R. Bollweg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enduro Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Mateo Z. Fowler
Represented By: John F. Luman, III
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Represented By: Thomas John Welk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Enduro Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Mateo Z. Fowler
Represented By: John F. Luman, III
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Represented By: Thomas John Welk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Hansen Manufacturing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.