Stormo v. City of Sioux Falls et al

Plaintiff: Eric Stormo
Defendant: City of Sioux Falls, R. Shawn Tornow, Dave Munson, Mike Huether, Pat Kneip, Doug Barthel and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2012cv04057
Filed: April 2, 2012
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2016 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 120 Motion to Modify the Summary Judgment Order; granting 123 Motion to Compel; denying 123 Motion for Sanctions; denying 123 Motion for Default Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 141 Motion to Compel; denying 141 Motion for Sanctions; denying 139 Motion for Sanctions; granting 144 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/19/16. (SLW)
October 15, 2015 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 97 Motion to Strike ; granting in part 99 Motion to Amend/Correct( Discovery due by 1/15/2016, Motions due by 2/15/2016.), overruling 101 Objections . Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/15/15. (SLW)
August 31, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/31/2015. (CG)
August 14, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion to Deem Requests for Admissions Admitted. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/14/2015. (CG)
August 4, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Objection to Magistrate Judge Order; denying 38 Motion for Sanctions; granting 42 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion for Sanctions; denying 45 Motion for Hearing; granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part [] Motion to Compel. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/4/2014. (KC)
November 21, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 defendants' motion for Summary Judgment and granting 26 plaintiff's motion to Amend/Correct to the extent it is consistent with this order. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/21/12. (KC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stormo v. City of Sioux Falls et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Stormo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sioux Falls
Represented By: Gary P. Thimsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Shawn Tornow
Represented By: Gary P. Thimsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Munson
Represented By: Gary P. Thimsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Huether
Represented By: Gary P. Thimsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Kneip
Represented By: Gary P. Thimsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Barthel
Represented By: Gary P. Thimsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?