Gard v. Dooley et al
Plaintiff: Rex Gard
Defendant: Bob Dooley, Susan Jacobs, Muriel Naminga, Andy Gates, Kelly Swanson, Jenifer Benboom, John Trewiellar and Barry Schroeter
Case Number: 4:2014cv04023
Filed: February 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Aurora
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting 198 to the extent that the remaining ADA claims are as set forth in this Order; denying 223 Renewed Motion to File Summary Judgment and denying as moot 226 Plaintiff's Objection to Renewed Motion to File Summary Judgment; de nying [205-220] Applications for Writ of Habeas Corpus; appointing John Hinrichs to represent the Plaintiff. Plaintiff shall, through counsel, file a Witness List with the names of each witness he requests be subpoenaed for trial, with good cause shown why that witness should be subpoenaed. A new court trial date will be scheduled by subsequent Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/31/17. (DJP)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER denying 190 Objection to Magistrate Judge Order. Claims against all individuals in their individual capacities are dismissed. Claims against other Department of Corrections Staff, Department of Health Staff, and CMB Food Services Employees, unknown at this time, are dismissed. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/1/17. (SLW)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER denying defendants' 186 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Deadlines. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 07/25/17. (Duffy, Veronica)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER denying 179 Motion to Extend; denying 181 Motion to Compel; denying 182 Motion for Medical Expert. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 7/20/2017. (CG)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER denying 173 Motion for Discovery. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 2/28/2017. (CG)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER denying 167 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 1/23/2017. (CG)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting 86 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting 134 Report and Recommendation; denying 148 Objection to Report and Recommendation.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/26/16. (DJP)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying 98 Ex Parte Motion; granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion; denying 100 Motion; denying 101 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 108 Motion for Leave; denying 114 Motion for Sanctions; denying 116 Motion; denying 121 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 12/23/2015. (CG)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying 96 Motion for Recusal. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 6/29/2015. (CG)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying 63 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 66 Motion to Extend Deadlines; denying 68 Motion to Sever; granting 72 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 2/13/2015. (CG)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying as moot 33 Motion for Hearing; granting 34 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Gard must file an amended complaint with the Court on or before September 26, 2014. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/26/14. (DJP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gard v. Dooley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Gard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muriel Naminga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenifer Benboom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Trewiellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Schroeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?