McAllister-Lewis v. Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Judith McAllister-Lewis
Defendant: Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America, LTD. and The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Case Number: 4:2014cv04103
Filed: July 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: McCook
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 157 Motion to Compel; granting 165 Motion to Quash. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 5/17/18. (DJP)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 32. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/11/2017. (JLS)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (replacing The Court's Order Document 124 ) Granting The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's Motion for Summary Judgment, Doc 80; Granting in Part and Denying in part Defendant Goodyear Tires North America, Ltd. a/k/a Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC's, Motion for Summary Judgment, Doc. 83. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 7/27/2017. (MWT)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 80 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 5/24/17. (SLW)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion to Exclude; denying 79 Motion to Exclude. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 5/19/2017. (JLS)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 3/24/2016. (CG)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED ORDER regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 22 . Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/1/2015. (CG)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/17/2015. (CG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAllister-Lewis v. Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith McAllister-Lewis
Represented By: David R. Centracchio
Represented By: Richard R. Gordon
Represented By: James L. Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?