Janvrin v. Continental Resources, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jerry Janvrin
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2014cv04124
Filed: August 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Harding
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying 93 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for New Trial. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/30/17. (DJP)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 26 Motion in Limine; granting 27 Motion to Extend Deadlines ( Discovery due by 11/12/2016). Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/1/2016. (JLS) Modified to add text on 9/1/2016 (JLS).
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/27/16. (DJP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janvrin v. Continental Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Janvrin
Represented By: Kenneth E. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?