United States of America, for the use and benefit of Ash Equipment Co., Inc. et al v. Morris, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
United States of America, for the use and benefit of Ash Equipment Co., Inc. and Ash Equipment Co., Inc. |
Defendant: |
Morris, Inc., United Fire and Casualty Company and Red Wilk Construction, Inc. |
Cross_claimant: |
Morris, Inc. and United Fire and Casualty Company |
Cross_defendant: |
Red Wilk Construction, Inc. |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv04131 |
Filed: |
August 22, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of South Dakota |
Office: |
Southern Division Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Lawrence L. Piersol |
Nature of Suit: |
Miller Act |
Cause of Action: |
40 U.S.C. § 270 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 8, 2017 |
Filing
262
ORDER denying 149 Motion to Exclude. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/8/2017. (CG)
|
May 15, 2017 |
Filing
249
ORDER denying 235 Motion in Limine. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 5/15/2017. (CG)
|
May 12, 2017 |
Filing
248
ORDER granting 231 Defendant Morris' Motion for Leave to Amend Answer. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 5/12/2017. (CG)
|
September 6, 2016 |
Filing
115
ORDER granting 95 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 9/6/2016. (CG)
|
August 18, 2016 |
Filing
110
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 55 Alternative Motion for Rule 56(f) Relief. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/18/16. (DJP)
|
July 28, 2016 |
Filing
104
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 7/28/2016. (CG)
|
May 24, 2016 |
Filing
77
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 5/24/2016. (CG)
|
September 29, 2015 |
Filing
39
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/29/15. (DJP)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: United States of America, for the use and benefit of Ash Equipment Co., Inc. et al v. Morris, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: United States of America, for the use and benefit of Ash Equipment Co., Inc. |
Represented By: |
Brian J. Donahoe |
Represented By: |
Joseph M. Dylla |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Ash Equipment Co., Inc. |
Represented By: |
Brian J. Donahoe |
Represented By: |
Joseph M. Dylla |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Morris, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Ronald G. Schmidt |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: United Fire and Casualty Company |
Represented By: |
Ronald G. Schmidt |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Red Wilk Construction, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross_claimant: Morris, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Ronald G. Schmidt |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross_claimant: United Fire and Casualty Company |
Represented By: |
Ronald G. Schmidt |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross_defendant: Red Wilk Construction, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?