Perfetti Van Melle USA Inc. et al v. Midwest Processing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Perfetti Van Melle USA Inc. and Perfetti Van Melle Benelux B.V.
Defendant: Midwest Processing, LLC and Dexter Jorgensen
Case Number: 4:2015cv04093
Filed: May 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Roberto A. Lange
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 60 Motion to Quash. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 5/20/16. (DJP)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part Request for Damages 8 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 2/26/2016. (JLS)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part Request for Damages and 8 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 2/25/16. (DJP)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 OPINION AND ORDER granting 40 Motion for Leave to serve subpoena on Silver Dollar Sales, Inc. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 9/16/15. (DJP)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPINION AND ORDER to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Held in Contempt of Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 7/2/2015. (JLS)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION AND ORDER granting 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 10 Motion to Expedite. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on June 4, 2015. (DLC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perfetti Van Melle USA Inc. et al v. Midwest Processing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perfetti Van Melle USA Inc.
Represented By: Aaron M. Bernay
Represented By: Michael L. Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perfetti Van Melle Benelux B.V.
Represented By: Aaron M. Bernay
Represented By: Michael L. Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Processing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?