Hylland v. Flaum
Plaintiff: Richard Hylland
Defendant: Russell Flaum
Case Number: 4:2016cv04060
Filed: May 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Roberto A. Lange
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION AND ORDER on Pending Motions in 4:16-cv-4168. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 1/16/2018. (JLS)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting in part 29 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 9/20/17. (DJP)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION AND ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/22/2016. (LH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hylland v. Flaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hylland
Represented By: Robert A. Christenson
Represented By: Norman T. Finkel
Represented By: G. Terence Nader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Flaum
Represented By: William R. Klein
Represented By: Jennifer L. Van Anne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?